NH SB361 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-4)
Status: Passed on June 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-20 - Signed by the Governor on 06/10/2016; Chapter 0240; Effective 01/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-4)
Status: Passed on June 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-20 - Signed by the Governor on 06/10/2016; Chapter 0240; Effective 01/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Banning the sale and possession of synthetic urine and urine additives.
Title
Banning the sale and possession of synthetic urine and urine additives.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-20 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/10/2016; Chapter 0240; Effective 01/01/2017 |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20 |
2016-06-03 | House | Enrolled 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 58 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Moved to Concur with House Amendment # 1382h, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/19/2016; Senate Journal 18 |
2016-05-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1382h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 21 |
2016-05-11 | House | Amendment #2016-1382h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 21 |
2016-05-06 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1382h (NT) for 05/11/2016 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 29 P. 11 |
2016-04-14 | House | Executive Session: 04/13/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-03-16 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/22/2016 04:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-03-15 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/22/2016 03:15 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-03-15 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/24/2016 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-03-10 | House | Public Hearing: 03/15/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-02-16 | House | Introduced 02/11/2016 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 17 P. 50 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/11/2016; Senate Journal 5 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Special Order SB 361 to the Beginning of the Regular Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/11/2016; Senate Calendar 5 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Hearing: 01/26/2016, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 3 |
2015-12-29 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |