NH SB360 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-27 - Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-27 - Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to national guard educational benefits.
Title
Relative to national guard educational benefits.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] |
Rep. Michael Moffett [R] | Rep. Barbara Shaw [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-19 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-04-19 | House | Executive Session: 04/19/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-04-12 | House | Public Hearing: 04/19/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/16/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Hearing: 02/02/2022, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2021-12-17 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1 |