NH SB36 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-26 - Signed by the Governor on 07/23/2021; Chapter 0147; Effective 09/21/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to residency under auto insurance policies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to residency under auto insurance policies.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-26SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/23/2021; Chapter 0147; Effective 09/21/2021
2021-07-12HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021
2021-07-12SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20
2021-06-10SenateSen. French Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19
2021-06-03HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-1303h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021
2021-06-03HouseAmendment # 2021-1303h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021
2021-05-25HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1303h (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 4
2021-05-05HouseExecutive Session: 05/13/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93883325643
2021-03-17HousePublic Hearing: 03/30/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99157160886 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-03-10HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 4 P. 48
2021-02-04SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/04/2021; Senate Journal 3
2021-01-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/04/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9
2021-01-13SenateRemote Hearing: 01/19/2021, 09:10 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 7
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 3

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback