NH SB358 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0315; Effective 08/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0315; Effective 08/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to reorganization of the department of education.
Title
Relative to reorganization of the department of education.
Sponsors
Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0315; Effective 08/24/2018 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Reagan Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1475h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2018 |
2018-05-02 | House | Amendment # 2018-1475h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1475h for 05/02/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 5 |
2018-04-03 | House | Executive Session: 04/17/2018 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-03-14 | House | Public Hearing: 03/27/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Education House Journal 7 P. 50 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0064s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/18/2018; Senate Journal 2 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0064s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/18/2018; Senate Journal 2 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0064s, 01/18/2018; Senate Calendar 3 |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Hearing: 01/09/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:10 am; Senate Calendar 48 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 1 |