NH SB354 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0223; Effective 08/16/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0223; Effective 08/16/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to insurance adjuster licensing, insurance producer licensing fees, and the sale of credit life and credit accident and health insurance policies by banks.
Title
Relative to insurance adjuster licensing, insurance producer licensing fees, and the sale of credit life and credit accident and health insurance policies by banks.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Kevin Cavanaugh [D] | Rep. Christy Bartlett [D] |
Rep. John Potucek [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0223; Effective 08/16/2022 |
2022-06-07 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/25/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. French Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1346h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-05-04 | House | Amendment # 1346h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-22 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1346h (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-04-13 | House | Executive Session: 04/20/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-03-30 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/07/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-03-30 | House | Public Hearing: 04/06/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/03/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 5 |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Hearing: 01/18/2022, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 50 |
2021-12-17 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1 |