NH SB353 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Signed by the Governor on 07/01/2022; Chapter 0315; Effective 08/30/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the education professional standards board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the education professional standards board.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-07-07SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/01/2022; Chapter 0315; Effective 08/30/2022
2022-06-22SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13
2022-06-22HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14
2022-05-26SenateConference Committee Report # 2022-2029c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/26/2022; Senate Journal 13
2022-05-26HouseConference Committee Report 2022-2029c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/26/2022
2022-05-18HouseConference Committee Report # 2022-2029c Filed 05/16/2022; New Amendment
2022-05-13SenateCommittee of Conference Meeting: 05/16/2022, 1:30 p.m., Room 100, State House
2022-05-12HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. Cordelli, Ford, Myler 05/12/2022 House Journal 13
2022-05-12HouseHouse Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Ladd): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 13
2022-05-12SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Ward, Ricciardi, Prentiss; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12
2022-05-12SenateSen. Ward Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12
2022-05-04HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 1755h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11
2022-05-04HouseAmendment # 1755h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11
2022-04-27HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1755h (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)
2022-04-20HouseExecutive Session: 04/26/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
2022-04-20HousePublic Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 1675h: 04/26/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
2022-03-28HousePublic Hearing: 04/06/2022 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
2022-03-23HouseIntroduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Education
2022-02-03SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2
2022-01-27SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/03/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 5
2022-01-04SenateHearing: 01/13/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 2
2021-12-15SenateTo Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback