NH SB353 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Signed by the Governor on 05/19/2016; Chapter 0096; Effective 07/18/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Signed by the Governor on 05/19/2016; Chapter 0096; Effective 07/18/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to names on ballots.
Title
Relative to names on ballots.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/19/2016; Chapter 0096; Effective 07/18/2016 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/05/2016); Senate Journal 17 |
2016-05-12 | House | Enrolled 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 46 |
2016-04-20 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 5 |
2016-04-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/20/2016 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 24 P. 8 |
2016-03-30 | House | Executive Session: 04/12/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2016-03-30 | House | Public Hearing: 04/05/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2016-03-15 | House | Introduced 03/10/2016 and referred to Election Law House Journal 25 P. 118 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/03/2016; Senate Journal 7 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/03/2016; Senate Calendar 7 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Hearing: 02/17/2016, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 6 |
2015-12-29 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |