NH SB349 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 19 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Enrolled 04/19/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to course requirements in a career and technical education program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to course requirements in a career and technical education program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19HouseEnrolled 04/19/2018
2018-04-18SenateEnrolled (In recess 04/12/2018); Senate Journal 13
2018-04-05HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 4
2018-03-21HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/05/2018 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 4
2018-03-21HouseExecutive Session: 03/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 207
2018-03-14HousePublic Hearing: 03/20/2018 09:50 am Legislative Office Building 207
2018-03-12HouseIntroduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Education House Journal 7 P. 50
2018-02-01SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3
2018-01-16SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/01/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 5
2017-12-14SenateHearing: 01/16/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 48
2017-12-12SenateTo Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback