NH SB348 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor on 05/20/2022; Chapter 0093; Effective 01/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to political expenditures and contributions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to political expenditures and contributions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-24SenateSigned by the Governor on 05/20/2022; Chapter 0093; Effective 01/01/2023
2022-05-13HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 05/12/2022
2022-05-13SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/12/2022); Senate Journal 13
2022-04-21HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/21/2022 House Journal 10
2022-04-14HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 7
2022-04-04HouseExecutive Session: 04/13/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
2022-04-04HousePublic Hearing: 04/08/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
2022-04-01HouseIntroduced 03/31/2022 and referred to Election Law
2022-03-31SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2022-1174s and 2022-1299s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7
2022-03-31SenateSen. Soucy Floor Amendment # 2022-1299s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7
2022-03-31SenateCommittee Amendment # 2022-1174s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7
2022-03-31SenateSpecial Order to the end of the Regular Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted Senate Journal 7
2022-03-22SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1174s, 03/31/2022; Senate Calendar 13
2022-02-08SenateHearing: 02/14/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 7
2021-12-15SenateTo Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback