NH SB347 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-23 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 36
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-23 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 36
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to infrastructure appropriations for reimbursement to the city of Laconia.
Title
Relative to infrastructure appropriations for reimbursement to the city of Laconia.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Sen. James Gray [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Daniel Innis [R] |
Rep. Michael Moffett [R] | Rep. Mike Bordes [R] | Rep. Steven Bogert [R] | Rep. Charlie St. Clair [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-23 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 36 |
2024-05-14 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 05/14/2024 (Vote 25-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 20 P. 10 |
2024-05-08 | House | Executive Session: 05/13/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-04-17 | House | Division I Work Session: 05/07/2024 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2024-04-11 | House | Public Hearing: 04/17/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Finance House Journal 6 P. 138 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/08/2024; Senate Journal 3 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/08/2024, Vote 7-0; Senate Calendar 6 |
2023-12-14 | Senate | Hearing: 01/09/2024, Room 103, State House, 01:40 pm; Senate Calendar 48 |
2023-12-11 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 1 |