NH SB343 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/05/2022 House Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/05/2022 House Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study room occupancy tax revenues and fees and the formula for distribution to municipalities.
Title
Establishing a committee to study room occupancy tax revenues and fees and the formula for distribution to municipalities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/05/2022 House Journal 12 |
2022-04-26 | House | Executive Session: 04/14/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-04-20 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 17-5; Regular Calendar) |
2022-04-06 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/14/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-04-06 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/12/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-03-29 | House | Public Hearing: 04/05/2022 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Ways and Means |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0421s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Sen. Prentiss Floor Amendment # 2022-0421s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Special Order to after the Committee on Education, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/16/2022; Senate Calendar 7 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Special Order to the Next Session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/03/2022; Senate Calendar 5 |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Hearing: 01/26/2022, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 2 |
2021-12-15 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 1 |