NH SB340 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by the Governor on 05/15/2018; Chapter 0050; Effective 07/14/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by the Governor on 05/15/2018; Chapter 0050; Effective 07/14/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the commissioner of revenue administration's assessment report.
Title
Relative to the commissioner of revenue administration's assessment report.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/15/2018; Chapter 0050; Effective 07/14/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Enrolled 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 2 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/12/2018); Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-05 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 7 |
2018-03-28 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/05/2018 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 6 |
2018-03-28 | House | Executive Session: 03/27/2018 Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-03-14 | House | Public Hearing: 03/20/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 7 P. 53 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0803s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0803s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0803s, 03/08/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Hearing: 02/07/2018, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am, on proposed amendment # 2018-0059s; Senate Calendar 6 |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Hearing: 01/10/2018, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 48 |
2017-12-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |