NH SB34 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB34

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-09 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2781h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/09/2020 House Journal 2 P. 53
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the applicability of certain DWI prohibitions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the applicability of certain DWI prohibitions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-09HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2781h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/09/2020 House Journal 2 P. 53
2020-01-09HouseAmendment # 2019-2781h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/09/2020 House Journal 2 P. 53
2020-01-09HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed DV 158-184 01/09/2020 House Journal 2 P. 53
2019-10-25HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2781h
2019-10-25HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 9-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 31
2019-10-02HouseExecutive Session: 10/22/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203
2019-09-18HouseFull Committee Work Session: 10/08/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203
2019-09-18HouseFull Committee Work Session: 10/01/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203
2019-04-24HouseRetained in Committee
2019-04-16HouseExecutive Session: 04/23/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 203
2019-04-11HousePublic Hearing: 04/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Transportation House Journal 11 P. 68
2019-03-07SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0611s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-03-07SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0611s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-02-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0611s, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12
2019-01-17SenateHearing: 01/22/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 7
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4

Same As/Similar To

SB34 (Carry Over) 2019-10-25 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2781h

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback