NH SB338 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-01 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-01 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the growing of cannabis if it becomes legal.
Title
Relative to the growing of cannabis if it becomes legal.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 02/01/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 5 |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Hearing: 01/11/2018, Room 100, State House, 09:50 am; Senate Calendar 48 |
2017-12-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |