NH SB329 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Sen. Bradley Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Sen. Bradley Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study barriers to specific housing development in New Hampshire and establishing a procedure for overriding a local tax cap.
Title
Establishing a commission to study barriers to specific housing development in New Hampshire and establishing a procedure for overriding a local tax cap.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-05 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1828h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/05/2022 House Journal 12 |
2022-05-05 | House | Amendment # 1828h: Amendment Adopted DV 171-152 05/05/2022 House Journal 12 |
2022-04-27 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-04-27 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1828h(NT) (Vote 10-8; Regular Calendar) |
2022-04-19 | House | Executive Session: 04/27/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2022-04-06 | House | Executive Session: 04/18/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2022-03-29 | House | Public Hearing: 04/07/2022 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Municipal and County Government |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0344s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-0344s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0344s, 02/03/2022; Senate Calendar 5 |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Hearing: 01/27/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |