NH SB325 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-11 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-11 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to vaccines administered by pharmacists.
Title
Relative to vaccines administered by pharmacists.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 100 |
2016-04-21 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 05/11/2016 (Vote 13-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 29 P. 24 |
2016-04-14 | House | Executive Session: 04/13/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-03-22 | House | Public Hearing: 03/29/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-03-15 | House | Introduced 03/10/2016 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 25 P. 118 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0593s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/03/2016; Senate Journal 7 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0593s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/03/2016 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Special Order SB 325 to after the Committee on Education, Without Objection, Motion Adopted |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0593s, 03/03/2016; Senate Calendar 7 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Hearing: 01/26/2016, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:20 pm; Senate Calendar 3 |
2015-12-29 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |