NH SB320 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Vetoed by Governor 06/21/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Vetoed by Governor 06/21/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to non-academic surveys administered by a public school to its students.
Title
Relative to non-academic surveys administered by a public school to its students.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. John Burt [R] | Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] |
Rep. Gregory Hill [R] | Rep. Josh Moore [R] | Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-01 - Senate - Committee of Conference Report 1988c (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - House - Adopt CofC Report (Y: 285 N: 56 NV: 28 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 52 N: 274 NV: 22 Abs: 50) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - House - Adopt CofC Report (Y: 285 N: 56 NV: 28 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 52 N: 274 NV: 22 Abs: 50) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-22 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 06/21/2016 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20 |
2016-06-15 | House | Enrolled 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 66 |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1988c; Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Adopted; 06/01/2016 Senate Journal 19 |
2016-06-01 | House | Conference Committee Report 1988c: Adopted, Regular Calendar 285-56 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 12 |
2016-05-27 | House | Conference Committee Report #2016-1988c Filed 05/26/2016; As Amended by the House |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Conferee Change; Senator Bradley Replaces Senator Watters Senate Journal 19 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/19/2016, 02:00 pm, Room 103, State House |
2016-05-11 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Ladd, Balcom, Cordelli, Shaw 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 5 |
2016-05-11 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Ladd): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 5 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Reagan, Avard, Watters; 04/14/2016; Senate Journal 13 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Sen. Reagan Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment # 1143h; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/14/2016; Senate Journal 13 |
2016-04-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1143h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/06/2016 House Journal 31 P. 16 |
2016-04-06 | House | FLAM #2016-1240h (NT) (Rep. Horrigan): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 52-274 04/06/2016 House Journal 31 P. 13 |
2016-04-06 | House | Amendment #2016-1143h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/06/2016 House Journal 31 P. 13 |
2016-03-30 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate House Calendar 21 P. 12 |
2016-03-30 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1143h for 04/06/2016 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 21 P. 12 |
2016-03-22 | House | Executive Session: 03/29/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2016-03-16 | House | Public Hearing: 03/22/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2016-03-15 | House | Introduced 03/10/2016 and referred to Education House Journal 25 P. 118 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0551s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/03/2016; Senate Journal 7 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0551s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/03/2016 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0551s, 03/03/2016; Senate Calendar 7 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Hearing: 02/02/2016, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2015-12-29 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 1 |