NH SB32 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-23 - Hearing: 01/29/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:50 pm; Senate Calendar 8
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Reestablishing the commission to study greater transparency in pharmaceutical costs and drug rebate programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reestablishing the commission to study greater transparency in pharmaceutical costs and drug rebate programs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-23SenateHearing: 01/29/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:50 pm; Senate Calendar 8
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback