NH SB319 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 179-150 05/04/2022 House Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 179-150 05/04/2022 House Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to vaccination status and wellness incentives.
Title
Relative to vaccination status and wellness incentives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 179-150 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-28 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-04-28 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) |
2022-04-28 | House | Executive Session: 04/27/2022 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-04-13 | House | Executive Session: 04/20/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-03-30 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/07/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-03-30 | House | Public Hearing: 04/06/2022 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/16/2022; Senate Calendar 7 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-0318s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0318s, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0318s, 02/03/2022; Senate Calendar 5 |
2021-12-17 | Senate | Hearing: 01/13/2022, Room Representatives Hall, State House, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 50 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |