NH SB318 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-18 - To Be Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 09/25/2019;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-18 - To Be Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 09/25/2019;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to donations to the education tax credit program.
Title
Relative to donations to the education tax credit program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-18 | Senate | To Be Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 09/25/2019; |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Pending Motion Committee Amendment # 2019-1203s; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Sen. D'Allesandro Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 15Y-8N, Motion Adopted; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1203s, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Hearing: 03/13/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 4 |