NH SB316 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Signed by the Governor on 05/29/2018; Chapter 0116; Effective 07/28/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the regulation of online auctions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the regulation of online auctions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-19 - Senate - OTP (Y: 192 N: 137 NV: 28 Abs: 35) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateSigned by the Governor on 05/29/2018; Chapter 0116; Effective 07/28/2018
2018-05-01SenateEnrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15
2018-05-01HouseEnrolled 04/26/2018
2018-04-19HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 192-137 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 13
2018-04-11HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/19/2018 (Vote 11-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 11
2018-04-03HouseExecutive Session: 04/10/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2018-03-28HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 04/03/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2018-03-20HousePublic Hearing: 03/28/2018 02:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2018-03-12HouseIntroduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 7 P. 50
2018-02-15SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-0507s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4
2018-02-15SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-0507s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4
2018-02-08SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0507s, 02/15/2018; Senate Calendar 7
2018-01-24Senate===ROOM CHANGE=== Hearing: 02/06/2018, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 5
2017-12-08SenateTo Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback