NH SB315 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directing that a portion of revenue distributions from the meals and rooms municipal revenue fund be used by municipalities to reduce the local property tax rate.
Title
Directing that a portion of revenue distributions from the meals and rooms municipal revenue fund be used by municipalities to reduce the local property tax rate.
Sponsors
Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Sen. Rebecca Perkins Kwoka [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
Sen. Suzanne Prentiss [D] | Rep. Janet Wall [D] | Rep. Mary Wallner [D] | Rep. Peter Leishman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Sen. Hennessey Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/03/2022; Senate Calendar 5 |
2021-12-29 | Senate | Hearing: 01/19/2022, Room 100, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 1 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 1 |