NH SB314 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to modified risk tobacco products.
Title
Relative to modified risk tobacco products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 03/17/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Hearing: 01/12/2022, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 50 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 1 |