NH SB314 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0211; Effective 08/07/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0211; Effective 08/07/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to regulation of mortgage bankers, brokers, servicers, and originators.
Title
Relative to regulation of mortgage bankers, brokers, servicers, and originators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0211; Effective 08/07/2018 |
2018-05-15 | House | Enrolled 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1844e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/03/2018); Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1844e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/03/2018 |
2018-04-26 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2018-04-19 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/26/2018 (Vote 12-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 9 |
2018-04-12 | House | Executive Session: 04/17/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-04-11 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-04-03 | House | Public Hearing: 04/10/2018 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-03-27 | House | Introduced 03/22/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 10 P. 52 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1089s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/21/2018; Senate Journal 9 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1089s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2018; Senate Journal 9 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1089s, 03/21/2018; Senate Calendar 13 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | ===ROOM CHANGE=== Hearing: 02/06/2018, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 5 |
2017-12-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1 |