NH SB31 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 12 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Enrolled 06/27/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Adding a member to the New Hampshire community development advisory committee and exempting the community development finance authority from the administrative procedure act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adding a member to the New Hampshire community development advisory committee and exempting the community development finance authority from the administrative procedure act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-07-10SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-27SenateConference Committee Report # 2019-2597c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/27/2019; Senate Journal 21
2019-06-27HouseConference Committee Report 2597c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/27/2019
2019-06-20HouseConference Committee Report # 2019-2597c Filed 06/13/2019; As Amended by the House
2019-06-17HouseConferee Change: Rep. Porter Replaces Rep. Maggiore 06/13/2019
2019-06-19SenateCommittee of Conference Meeting: 06/19/2019, 09:50 am, Room 103, State House
2019-06-13HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. Josephson, Mombourquette, Maggiore, MacDonald 06/13/2019
2019-06-13HouseHouse Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Carson): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019
2019-06-13SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Carson, Cavanaugh, Chandley; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-06-13SenateSen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-06-13SenateWithout Objection, Sen. Carson Withdraws the recommendation to Concur, Motion Adopted; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-05-23HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1462h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 43
2019-05-23HouseAmendment # 2019-1462h (NT): Amendment Adopted DV 219-127 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 43
2019-05-07HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-05-07HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1462h for 05/23/2019 (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 25 P. 11
2019-04-10HouseExecutive Session: 04/23/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301
2019-04-08HousePublic Hearing: 04/09/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 11 P. 68
2019-02-14SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/14/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-15SenateHearing: 01/23/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 7
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback