NH SB309 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Signed by the Governor on 05/19/2016; Chapter 0094; Effective 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Signed by the Governor on 05/19/2016; Chapter 0094; Effective 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to sulfur limits of certain liquid fuels.
Title
Relative to sulfur limits of certain liquid fuels.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/19/2016; Chapter 0094; Effective 07/01/2018 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/05/2016); Senate Journal 17 |
2016-05-12 | House | Enrolled 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 46 |
2016-04-20 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 8 |
2016-04-07 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/20/2016 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 24 P. 11 |
2016-03-22 | House | Executive Session: 03/31/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2016-03-10 | House | Public Hearing: 03/15/2016 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2016-02-16 | House | Introduced 02/11/2016 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 17 P. 50 |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/04/2016; Senate Journal 4 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/04/2016; Senate Calendar 4 |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Hearing: 01/27/2016, Room 100, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2015-12-29 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1 |