NH SB308 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-17 - House Remove From The Table (Rep Bettencourt): Motion Failed Division Vote 97-148; House Journal 46, PG.2482
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-17 - House Remove From The Table (Rep Bettencourt): Motion Failed Division Vote 97-148; House Journal 46, PG.2482
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proclaiming January 24, 2013 as Granny D. Day.
Title
Proclaiming January 24, 2013 as Granny D. Day.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Kathleen Hoelzel [R] | Sen. Molly Kelly [D] | Sen. Sylvia Larsen [D] |
Rep. Amanda Merrill [D] | Rep. Robert Perry [D] | Rep. Charles Weed [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-17 | House Remove From The Table (Rep Bettencourt): Motion Failed Division Vote 97-148; House Journal 46, PG.2482 | |
2012-05-16 | House Remove From The Table (Rep Baldasaro): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 146-166; House Journal 44, PG.2375-2377 | |
2012-05-16 | House Remove From The Table (Rep Weed): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 118-211; House Journal 44, PG.2352-2354 | |
2012-05-15 | House Lay On The Table (Rep Bettencourt): Motion Adopted Division Vote 208-86; House Journal 43, PG.2331 | |
2012-05-15 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Failed Division Vote 102-142 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote; House Journal 43, PG.2331 | |
2012-05-08 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 15 (Vote 8-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 37, PG.2041 | |
2012-04-20 | House Executive Session: 5/8/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-03-06 | House Public Hearing: 3/27/2012 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-02-22 | House Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 20, PG.1251 | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0827s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5, Pg.138 | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Sen. Kelly Floor Amendment #2012-0827s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 5, Pg.138 | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Sen. Kelly moved Ought to Pass; Senate Journal 5, Pg.138 | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 5, Pg.138 | |
2012-02-08 | Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 2/15/12; Senate Calendar 7 | |
2012-02-08 | Senate Special Order to 2/15/12, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 4, Pg.104 | |
2012-01-26 | Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 2/8/12; Senate Calendar 6 | |
2012-01-04 | Senate Hearing: 1/24/12, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 2 | |
2012-01-01 | Senate Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1, Pg.10 |