NH SB307 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-21 - Signed by the Governor on 03/18/2022; Chapter 0008; Effective 03/18/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-21 - Signed by the Governor on 03/18/2022; Chapter 0008; Effective 03/18/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the issuance of safe boater education certificates and commercial driving instruction.
Title
Relative to the issuance of safe boater education certificates and commercial driving instruction.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Suzanne Prentiss [D] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] |
Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Rep. Laura Telerski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 03/18/2022; Chapter 0008; Effective 03/18/2022 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 02/24/2022); Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-15 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-03-02 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-02-23 | House | Public Hearing: 03/01/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building201-203 |
2022-02-22 | House | Introduced 02/16/2022 and referred to Transportation |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-0313s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0313s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0313s, 02/03/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 5 |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Hearing: 01/11/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:10 pm, on proposed amendment # 2022-0026s; Senate Calendar 2 |
2021-12-22 | Senate | Hearing: 01/11/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 50 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 1 |