NH SB306 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing the housing appeals board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the housing appeals board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Rereferred (Y: 3 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Sen. Dietsch Floor Amendment 1366s (Y: 2 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenatePending Motion OT3rdg; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateSen. D'Allesandro Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateThe Chair rescinded OT3rdg, 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 18Y-5N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateSen. Dietsch Moved to Rerefer to Committee, Regular Calendar 3Y-20N, Motion Failed; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateSen. Dietsch Floor Amendment # 2019-1366s, Regular Calendar 2Y-21N, Amendment Failed; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15
2019-03-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2019-0858s, and 2019-1041s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenateWithout Objection, Sen. Cavanaugh Moved the Question, Motion Adopted; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenateSen. Giuda Floor Amendment # 2019-1041s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0858s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0858s, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13
2019-01-30SenateHearing: 02/06/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 9
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=1047&sy=2019&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB306
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&id=989&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=989
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=115&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0306&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB306&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1047
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=116&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0306&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB306&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1047
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=117&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0306&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB306&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1047

Bill Comments

feedback