NH SB304 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/24/2022; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/24/2022; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to discrimination in public workplaces and education.
Title
Relative to discrimination in public workplaces and education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/24/2022; Senate Journal 4 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/24/2022; Senate Calendar 8 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Special Order to the Next Session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/16/2022; Senate Calendar 7 |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Hearing: 01/12/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 50 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |