NH SB304 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
Pending: Senate Election Law and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to campaign contributions and expenditures, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to campaign contributions and expenditures, and making an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-06SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13
2019-02-07Senate==TIME CHANGE== Hearing: 02/13/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 11:30 am; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback