NH SB302 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 27 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-27 - Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 27 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-27 - Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the personal privacy protection act.
Title
Establishing the personal privacy protection act.
Sponsors
Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. William Gannon [R] | Sen. Gary Daniels [R] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] |
Sen. Harold French [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Rep. Bob Lynn [R] | Rep. Charlotte DiLorenzo [D] |
Rep. Mark McLean [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-24 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2022-2124e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-06-22 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2022-2124e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2022-2036c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/26/2022; Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-26 | House | Conference Committee Report 2022-2036c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-19 | House | Conference Committee Report # 2022-2036c Filed 05/17/2022; House Amendment + New Amendment |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Conferee Change; Senator Gannon Replaces Senator Whitley; Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/17/2022, 11:30 am, Room 100, State House |
2022-05-12 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. McLean, Wuelper, Silber 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-05-12 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Gordon): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Carson, French, Whitley; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-05 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1443h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/05/2022 House Journal 12 |
2022-05-05 | House | Amendment # 1443h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/05/2022 House Journal 12 |
2022-04-25 | House | Minority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study |
2022-04-25 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1443h (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar) |
2022-04-01 | House | Executive Session: 04/14/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-03-30 | House | Public Hearing: 04/07/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Judiciary |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0792s, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/24/2022; Senate Journal 4 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-0792s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/24/2022; Senate Journal 4 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0792s, 02/24/2022; Senate Calendar 8A |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Hearing: 01/11/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 50 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |