NH SB302 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-06 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to suspension and expulsion of pupils.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to suspension and expulsion of pupils.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-06SenateCommittee Report: Referred to Interim Study; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
2019-03-07SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-02-21SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12
2019-02-07SenateHearing: 02/19/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback