NH SB301 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-08 - Conference Committee Report: Not Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-08 - Conference Committee Report: Not Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the office of the right to know ombudsman and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Establishing the office of the right to know ombudsman and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | House | Conference Committee Report: Not Filed |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/17/2022, 11:00 am, Room 100, State House |
2022-05-12 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Wuelper, DiLorenzo, McLean 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-05-12 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Gordon): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Carson, French, Kahn; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1526h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-05-04 | House | Amendment # 1526h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-22 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1526h(NT) (Vote 20-1; Consent Calendar) |
2022-04-01 | House | Executive Session: 04/14/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-03-30 | House | Public Hearing: 04/06/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Judiciary |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0675s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-0675s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0675s, 02/16/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Hearing: 01/12/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 50 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |