NH SB30 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Signed by the Governor on 07/29/2019; Chapter 298; Effective 07/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Signed by the Governor on 07/29/2019; Chapter 298; Effective 07/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the advisory board on services for children, youth, and families.
Title
Relative to the advisory board on services for children, youth, and families.
Sponsors
Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/29/2019; Chapter 298; Effective 07/29/2019 |
2019-07-12 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 56 |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2019-2594c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/27/2019; Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-27 | House | Conference Committee Report 2594c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 2 |
2019-06-19 | House | Conference Committee Report # 2019-2594c Filed 06/13/2019; As Amended by the House |
2019-06-17 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Fowler Replaces Rep. Jurius 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 20 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Conferee Change; Senator Chandley Replaces Senator Rosenwald; Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 06/19/2019, 09:30 am, Room 103, State House |
2019-06-07 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Reps. Long, Berrien, French, Jurius): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 41 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Carson, Cavanaugh, Rosenwald; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1649h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 64 |
2019-05-08 | House | Amendment # 2019-1649h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 64 |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1649h for 05/08/2019 (Vote 15-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 13 |
2019-04-24 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 04/30/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-04-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/23/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-04-10 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/16/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-04-10 | House | Public Hearing: 04/16/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 11 P. 68 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/31/2019; Senate Journal 4 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/31/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 8 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Hearing: 01/23/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 7 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4 |