NH SB30 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Law Without Signature 07/11/2017; Chapter 0225; Effective 09/09/2017; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Law Without Signature 07/11/2017; Chapter 0225; Effective 09/09/2017; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defining woodland buffers and relative to such woodland buffers for the purposes of the shoreland protection act.
Title
Defining woodland buffers and relative to such woodland buffers for the purposes of the shoreland protection act.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Senate | Law Without Signature 07/11/2017; Chapter 0225; Effective 09/09/2017; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/22/2017); Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-27 | House | Enrolled 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 25 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2017-2373e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/08/2017); Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-20 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2017-2373e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2017 House Journal 18 P. 10 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Sen. Avard Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/08/2017; Senate Journal 19 |
2017-06-01 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1588h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 20 |
2017-06-01 | House | Amendment #2017-1588h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 20 |
2017-05-11 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1588h for 06/01/2017 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 9 |
2017-04-26 | House | Executive Session: 05/02/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2017-04-26 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/02/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2017-03-22 | House | Public Hearing: 03/29/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2017-03-16 | House | Introduced 03/09/2017 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 10 P. 76 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-0019s, Regular Calendar 18Y-6N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2017-0019s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0019s, 03/09/2017; Senate Calendar 12 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Special Order SB 30 to the next Senate session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/23/2017; Senate Journal 7 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0019s, 02/23/2017; Senate Calendar 11 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Special Order SB 30 to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/16/2017; Senate Journal 6 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0019s, 02/16/2017; Senate Calendar 10 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Special Order SB 30 to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/09/2017; Senate Journal 5 |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0019s, 02/09/2017; Senate Calendar 9 |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Special Order SB 30 to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 01/19/2017; Senate Journal 4 |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0019s, 01/19/2017; Senate Calendar 6 |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Hearing: 01/10/2017, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2017-01-05 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2017 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4 |