NH SB30 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Signed by the Governor on 05/21/2015; Chapter 0047; Effective 05/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Signed by the Governor on 05/21/2015; Chapter 0047; Effective 05/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the establishment of redevelopment districts in unincorporated places.
Title
Relative to the establishment of redevelopment districts in unincorporated places.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-06 - House - Ought to Pass Amended (Y: 293 N: 57 NV: 11 Abs: 37) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/21/2015; Chapter 0047; Effective 05/21/2015 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 5/7/2015); Senate Journal 14 |
2015-05-13 | House | Enrolled (in recess of 5/6/2015); House Journal 41, PG. 1779 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Sen. Forrester Concurs with House Amendment #1515h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 13 |
2015-05-06 | House | Reconsider (Rep Chandler): Motion Failed Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG. 1776 |
2015-05-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1515h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 293-57; House Journal 41, PG. 1772-1776 |
2015-05-06 | House | Amendment #1515h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG. 1772-1776 |
2015-04-30 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1515h (NT) for May 6 (Vote 22-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 33, PG. 1512 |
2015-04-23 | House | Executive Session: 4/30/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2015-04-22 | House | Division I Work Session: 4/28/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 212 |
2015-04-21 | House | ==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 4/21/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2015-04-16 | House | Division I Work Session: 4/23/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 212 |
2015-04-15 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 4/22/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2015-04-15 | House | Public Hearing: 4/21/2015 1:00 PM Representatives Hall; to include consideration of non-germane amendment #2015-1351h |
2015-04-15 | House | Vacated and Referred to Finance; House Journal 34, PG. 1534 |
2015-04-01 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 4/14/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-03-31 | House | Public Hearing: 4/14/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-03-31 | House | Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government (in recess of 3/25/2015); House Journal 28, PG. 1298 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1094s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Sen. Forrester Floor Amendment #2015-1094s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0997s, New Title, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0997s, New Title, 3/26/15; Senate Calendar 14 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0730s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0730s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0730s, New Title, 3/12/15; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Hearing:=== RECONVENE === 2/11/15, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9 |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Hearing: ===RECESSED=== 1/21/15, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:45 a.m. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Hearing: 1/21/15, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |