NH SB30 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Signed by the Governor on 06/20/2013; Chapter 0090; Effective 08/19/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Signed by the Governor on 06/20/2013; Chapter 0090; Effective 08/19/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Making technical corrections to tax laws.
Title
Making technical corrections to tax laws.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Odell [R] | Sen. Andrew Hosmer [D] | Rep. Norman Major [R] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] |
Rep. William Hatch [D] | Rep. David Campbell [D] | Sen. James Rausch [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/20/2013; Chapter 0090; Effective 08/19/2013 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled 5/2/13 |
2013-05-08 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 41, PG.1424 |
2013-05-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG.1393 |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 8 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar36, PG.1200 |
2013-04-18 | House | Executive Session: 4/24/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 ==Or Following House Session== |
2013-04-10 | House | Public Hearing: 4/18/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 31, PG.1073 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0120s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0120s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0120s, 2/14/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 8 |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Hearing: 1/22/13, Room 103, State House, 9:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 5 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Ways & Means; Senate Journal 4 |