NH SB3 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Signed by the Governor on 06/10/2021; Chapter 0074; Effective 06/10/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Signed by the Governor on 06/10/2021; Chapter 0074; Effective 06/10/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifying the tax treatment of federal Paycheck Protection Program loans.
Title
Clarifying the tax treatment of federal Paycheck Protection Program loans.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/10/2021; Chapter 0074; Effective 06/10/2021 |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/03/2021); Senate Journal 19 |
2021-06-08 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/04/2021 House Journal 9 P. 52 |
2021-06-04 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/04/2021 House Journal 9 P. 34 |
2021-05-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 23-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 29 |
2021-05-19 | House | Executive Session: 05/25/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96012823030 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-05-12 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/18/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96731823451 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-05-05 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 05/11/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91063233087 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-04-28 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/04/2021 11:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92340576130 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-04-14 | House | Public Hearing: 04/27/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95145735422 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-31 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 4 P. 50 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/18/2021; Senate Calendar 15 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 02/08/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 10 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 3 |