NH SB299 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the penalty for escape and relative to home cultivation of cannabis plants and the possession of certain cannabis-infused products.
Title
Relative to the penalty for escape and relative to home cultivation of cannabis plants and the possession of certain cannabis-infused products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-12 - Senate - Nonconcur (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1907h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-05-04 | House | Amendment # 1907h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-19 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 14-4; Regular Calendar) |
2022-04-19 | House | Executive Session: 04/08/2022 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-04-04 | House | Public Hearing: 04/08/2022 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0666s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-0666s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0666s, 02/16/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Hearing: 01/12/2022, Room 100, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 50 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |