NH SB299 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Signed by the Governor on 06/05/2019; Chapter 0066; Effective 01/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Signed by the Governor on 06/05/2019; Chapter 0066; Effective 01/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring good behavior as a condition for release without arrest or bail.
Title
Requiring good behavior as a condition for release without arrest or bail.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/05/2019; Chapter 0066; Effective 01/01/2020 |
2019-05-16 | House | Enrolled 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 101 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/15/2019); Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 3 |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/02/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 4 |
2019-04-10 | House | Executive Session: 04/24/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-04-10 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/24/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-04-10 | House | Public Hearing: 04/23/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 11 P. 71 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/21/2019; Senate Journal 6 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/21/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 11 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 02/05/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4 |