NH SB293 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to federally qualified health care centers and rural health centers reimbursement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to federally qualified health care centers and rural health centers reimbursement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - OTP (Y: 226 N: 134 NV: 9 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-14HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)
2019-10-02HouseExecutive Session: 11/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2019-09-23House==CANCELLED== Division III Work Session: 10/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2019-09-23HouseDivision III Work Session: 10/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2019-05-29HouseRetained in Committee
2019-05-22HouseExecutive Session: 05/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2019-05-14HouseDivision III Work Session: 05/21/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2019-05-08HouseDivision III Work Session: 05/14/2019 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2019-05-08HouseReferred to Finance 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 24
2019-05-08HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 226-134 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 24
2019-04-30HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/08/2019 (Vote 16-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 9
2019-04-10HouseExecutive Session: 04/18/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-04-10HouseDivision II Subcommittee Work Session: 04/17/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-04-10HouseDivision II Subcommittee Work Session: 04/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-04-03HousePublic Hearing: 04/10/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-04-01HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 11 P. 74
2019-03-28SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15
2019-03-14SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13
2019-01-31SenateHearing: 02/07/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 9
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=1098&sy=2019&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB293
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&id=1097&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&v=SP&id=1097
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=69&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0293&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB293&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1098
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=114&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0293&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB293&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1098
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=180&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=SB0293&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB293&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1098

Bill Comments

feedback