NH SB292 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-21 - Senate Sen. Morse Moved Laid On Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7, Pg.252
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-21 - Senate Sen. Morse Moved Laid On Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7, Pg.252
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to property taxation of certain manufactured housing.
Title
Relative to property taxation of certain manufactured housing.
Sponsors
Rep. David Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Tom DeBlois [R] | Sen. James Forsythe [R] | Sen. John Gallus [R] |
Sen. Gary Lambert [R] | Sen. Sylvia Larsen [D] | Sen. Jim Luther [R] | Sen. Andy Sanborn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Senate Sen. Morse Moved Laid On Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7, Pg.252 | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Committee Amendment 1217s, Not Voted On | |
2012-03-14 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-1217s, New Title, 3/21/12; Senate Calendar 11 | |
2012-01-18 | Senate Hearing: 1/24/12, Room 100, State House, 1:00 p.m; Senate Calendar 4 | |
2012-01-01 | Senate Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Ways & Means; Senate Journal 1, Pg.8 |