NH SB289 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0215
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0215
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to glucagon administration and relative to the dispenser report under the controlled drug prescription health and safety program.
Title
Relative to glucagon administration and relative to the dispenser report under the controlled drug prescription health and safety program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0215 |
2022-06-22 | Senate | I. Section 1 Effective 08/16/2022 |
2022-06-22 | Senate | II. Remainder Effective 06/17/2022 |
2022-06-07 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-04-21 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1336h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-21 | House | Amendment # 1336h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1336h(NT) (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 10 |
2022-04-08 | House | Executive Session: 04/05/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-03-29 | House | Public Hearing on Amendment # 2022-1223h: 04/05/2022 01:20 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-03-29 | House | Public Hearing: 04/05/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/03/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 5 |
2021-12-22 | Senate | Hearing: 01/19/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 50 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |