NH SB288 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2022; Chapter 0159; Effective 06/07/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2022; Chapter 0159; Effective 06/07/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the listing of immunizations for children.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the listing of immunizations for children.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Harold French [R] | Sen. William Gannon [R] |
Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Gregory Hill [R] | Rep. Susan Homola [R] | Rep. Keith Ammon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2022; Chapter 0159; Effective 06/07/2022 |
2022-05-27 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-22 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-04-22 | House | Executive Session: 04/19/2022 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-04-13 | House | Public Hearing: 04/19/2022 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-04-01 | House | Introduced 03/31/2022 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1206s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1206s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1206s, 03/31/2022; Senate Calendar 13 |
2021-12-17 | Senate | Hearing: 01/13/2022, Room Representatives Hall, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 50 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |