NH SB287 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB287
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Setting the maximum contaminant levels for certain perfluorochemicals in drinking water.
Title
Setting the maximum contaminant levels for certain perfluorochemicals in drinking water.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 4 |
2020-03-02 | House | Introduced 02/20/2020 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 5 P. 56 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0079s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-0079s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0079s, 02/13/2020; Senate Calendar 6 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Special Order to 02/13/2020, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 01/30/2020 Senate Journal 2 |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0079s, 01/30/2020; Senate Calendar 4 |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Hearing: 01/14/2020, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am, on proposed amendment # 2020-0040s; Senate Calendar 2 |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Special Order to the end of the Regular Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Sen. Watters Moved to refer SB 287 back to Energy and Natural Resources, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 01/08/2020; Senate Calendar 47 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing: 02/12/2019, Room 103, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB287 (Carry Over) 2019-11-20 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study