NH SB287 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-09 - Senate Sen. Bradley Moved Non-concur with House Amendment 1780h; Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 13, Pg.505
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-09 - Senate Sen. Bradley Moved Non-concur with House Amendment 1780h; Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 13, Pg.505
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to confidential prescription data.
Title
Relative to confidential prescription data.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Senate Sen. Bradley Moved Non-concur with House Amendment 1780h; Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 13, Pg.505 | |
2012-04-25 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1780h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 38, PG.2157-2160 | |
2012-04-25 | House Floor Amendment #2012-1780h(NT) (Rep Kurk), Adopted, Regular Calendar 226-106; House Journal 38, PG.2157-2160 | |
2012-04-18 | House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 33, PG.1924-1925 | |
2012-04-18 | House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for April 25 (Vote 15-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 33, PG.1924-1925 | |
2012-04-10 | House Executive Session: 4/17/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2012-04-10 | House ==Reconvened== Subcommittee Work Session: 4/12/2012 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2012-04-06 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/10/2012 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 205 ==Recessed== | |
2012-03-27 | House Continued Public Hearing: 4/3/2012 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2012-03-19 | House Public Hearing: 3/27/2012 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 ==RECESSED== | |
2012-03-08 | House Introduced and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 23, PG.1448 | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 6, Pg.158 | |
2012-02-21 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/7/12; Senate Calendar 9 | |
2012-01-24 | Senate Hearing: === TIME CHANGE === 2/2/12, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 5 | |
2012-01-01 | Senate Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1, Pg.8 |