NH SB283 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2022; Chapter 0158; Effective 08/06/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2022; Chapter 0158; Effective 08/06/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to membership of the council on autism spectrum disorders and the developmental services quality council.
Title
Relative to membership of the council on autism spectrum disorders and the developmental services quality council.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] |
Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. William Gannon [R] | Sen. Suzanne Prentiss [D] | Rep. Jess Edwards [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2022; Chapter 0158; Effective 08/06/2022 |
2022-05-27 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-22 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-04-22 | House | Executive Session: 04/12/2022 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-04-04 | House | Public Hearing: 04/12/2022 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-0176s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0176s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0176s, 02/03/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 5 |
2021-12-17 | Senate | Hearing: 01/12/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 50 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |