NH SB276 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on August 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-13 - Signed by the Governor on 08/12/2019; Chapter 322; Effective 10/11/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on August 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-13 - Signed by the Governor on 08/12/2019; Chapter 322; Effective 10/11/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to career readiness credentials for high school students.
Title
Relative to career readiness credentials for high school students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 08/12/2019; Chapter 322; Effective 10/11/2019 |
2019-07-12 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 56 |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2641e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-07-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2641e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 54 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Sen. Kahn Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20 |
2019-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1558h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 4 |
2019-05-02 | House | Amendment # 2019-1558h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 4 |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1558h for 05/02/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 4 |
2019-04-10 | House | Executive Session: 04/18/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-04-03 | House | Public Hearing: 04/10/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-03-28 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 11 P. 72 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1189s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Sen. Kahn Floor Amendment # 2019-1189s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/21/2019; Senate Calendar 14 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0661s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-0661s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0661s, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Hearing: 02/19/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 4 |