NH SB273 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by the Governor on 07/19/2019; Chapter 284; Effective 07/19/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by the Governor on 07/19/2019; Chapter 284; Effective 07/19/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the board of nursing and establishing a committee to study the regulation of nursing assistants by the board of nursing and criminal history record checks for nurses.
Title
Relative to the board of nursing and establishing a committee to study the regulation of nursing assistants by the board of nursing and criminal history record checks for nurses.
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Kahn [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] |
Rep. Carol McGuire [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/19/2019; Chapter 284; Effective 07/19/2019 |
2019-06-28 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20 |
2019-05-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1423h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 7 |
2019-05-08 | House | Amendment # 2019-1423h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 7 |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1423h (NT) for 05/08/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 |
2019-04-23 | House | Executive Session: 04/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-04-03 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/10/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-03-26 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Public Hearing: 04/02/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 11 P. 71 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0859s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-0859s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0859s, 03/14/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 02/06/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:20 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4 |